This case was last updated from Holmes County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/01/2022 at 15:41:15 (UTC).

FIRST FEDERAL BANK VS TATE, LINDSEY H Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 FIRST FEDERAL BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TATE, LINDSEY H. This case was filed in Holmes County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERTS, RUSSELL and ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERTS, RUSSELL

ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST FEDERAL BANK

Defendants

TATE, MATTHEW E

TATE, LINDSEY H

THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND U

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH, KELLEY LOUISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO MATTHEW E TATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOTHER DEFENDANTS' TATE'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT CIVIL STANDING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketJudge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number EP 4317

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $945.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LINDSEY H TATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MATTHEW E TATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 10/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase 302022CA000251CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less