This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:54:29 (UTC).

EDELSTEIN, SHARON VS GREENE, CRYSTAL Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 EDELSTEIN, SHARON filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GREENE, CRYSTAL. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDELSTEIN, SHARON

Respondents

WARD, LONNIE

GREENE, CRYSTAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CC000298CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N assigned

    Read MoreRead Less