This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:48:00 (UTC).

DUNAWAY, JAMES VS DUNAWAY, NICOLE

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 DUNAWAY, JAMES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUNAWAY, NICOLE. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY, REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN and DAVID JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

DAVID JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUNAWAY, JAMES

Respondent

DUNAWAY, NICOLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment Of Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/16/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge DAVID JOHNSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketUCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketActive Process Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CV 10833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase 302019DR000370DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less