This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:55:40 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS BROOKS, THOMAS P

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against BROOKS, THOMAS P. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BROOKS, THOMAS P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketIMAGING DOCKET CODE FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE book: 600 page: 223

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketIMAGING DOCKET CODE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number EP 2968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CC000297CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.