This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:56:53 (UTC).

DAVIS, SOFIA L VS HISLER, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 DAVIS, SOFIA L filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HISLER, BRIAN. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TAYLOR, LUCAS N and LUCAS TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

LUCAS TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, SOFIA L

Defendant

HISLER, BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL AS TO BRIAN HISLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF RECEIPT OF CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/02/2019 09:00; Judge: TAYLOR, LUCAS N; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: COURTHOUSE County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RENT DUE 11/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $128.75 Receipt Number CV 10840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $128.75 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $128.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM SOFIA DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number CV 10809

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CC000289CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N assigned

    Read MoreRead Less