This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 07/07/2019 14:23:46

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Other case was filed by CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ASS against WILSON, PATRICIA in the jurisdiction of Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Holmes County Courts
  • Judge TAYLOR, LUCAS N
  • Courthouse Holmes County Courthouse
  • County Holmes
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant WILSON, PATRICIA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified WILSON, PATRICIA C
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ASS
  • Represented By
    • DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL scheduled on 8/23/2019 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge LUCAS TAYLOR presiding.
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number EP 2716
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO
  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILING
  • 06/13/2019
  • COMPLAINT
  • 06/13/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/13/2019
  • Compliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 7/13/2019
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 302019CC000157CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019
  • 08/23/2019
  • Event Date: 08/23/2019 13:00; Judge: TAYLOR, LUCAS N; Docket Type: PRETRIAL; Location: MX County Courtroom

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.