This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 11/14/2020 at 21:04:33 (UTC).

COOMBS, LEDA FAYE VS WEIRICH, JAMES EDWIN

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 COOMBS, LEDA FAYE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WEIRICH, JAMES EDWIN. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY and REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOMBS, LEDA FAYE

Defendant

WEIRICH, JAMES EDWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVONGLOSKY, KRISTI MILLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDefense Attorney: KRISTI MILLER NOVONGLOSKY Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number EP 3370

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE KNOVONGLOSKY@GMAIL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 11/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase 302020DR000254DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVONGLOSKY, KRISTI MILLER