This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 11/25/2022 at 18:38:17 (UTC).

BROWN, ADA CLARA, First Federal Bank of Florida Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 BROWN, ADA CLARA, First Federal Bank of Florida was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

First Federal Bank of Florida

Decedent

BROWN, ADA CLARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHURCH, KELLEY LOUISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOTHER ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $41.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $41.00 Receipt Number CV 12891

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $41.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCAVEAT BY CREDITOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 11/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCAVEAT BY CREDITOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase 302022CP000126CVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less