This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:54:37 (UTC).

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY VS SUPERIOR MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against SUPERIOR MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TAYLOR, LUCAS N and LUCAS TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

LUCAS TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SUPERIOR MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/10/2020 13:00; Judge: TAYLOR, LUCAS N; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: COURTHOUSE County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SUPERIOR MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/10/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge LUCAS TAYLOR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number EP 2971

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CC000299CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant