This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 21:03:44 (UTC).

ALEXANDER, KELSEA VS ALEXANDER, NICHOLAS

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 ALEXANDER, KELSEA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALEXANDER, NICHOLAS. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY and REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER, KELSEA

Defendant

ALEXANDER, NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROVER, SHALENE

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCOUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF HUSBAND'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO WIFE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $392.50 Receipt Number EP 3362

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $392.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 11/7/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $392.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GROVERSERVICE@GMAIL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 10/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 302020DR000232DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING