This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 21:22:56 (UTC).

ZENKOR FUND G1, LLC VS RIVERA, MARTHA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 ZENKOR FUND G1, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RIVERA, MARTHA. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENKOR FUND G1, LLC

Defendant

RIVERA, MARTHA

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

11/17/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PLTF'S COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (DEFT TO DEPOSIT $800 INTO COURT REGISTRY BY 4PM ON 11/16/20 - CLERK FEE WAIVED / ALSO FILE PROOF OF EMPLOYMENT & COVID RELIEF APPS

11/12/2020:ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PLTF'S COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (DEFT TO DEPOSIT $800 INTO COURT REGISTRY BY 4PM ON 11/16/20 - CLERK FEE WAIVED / ALSO FILE PROOF OF EMPLOYMENT & COVID RELIEF APPS

NOTICE OF HEARING -ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS VIDEO - 11/12/2020 @ 1:30 PM

10/30/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING -ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS VIDEO - 11/12/2020 @ 1:30 PM

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/05/2020:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (NO $ IN REGISTRY)

10/05/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (NO $ IN REGISTRY)

ANSWER (MARTA)

09/29/2020:ANSWER (MARTA)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (MARTHA) SUB

09/28/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (MARTHA) SUB

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (MARTHA)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (MARTHA)

AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

09/21/2020:AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

3 - DAY NOTICE

09/21/2020:3 - DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (LEASE ATTACHED)

09/21/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (LEASE ATTACHED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event CCH on 11/12/2020 0130 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/12/2020 13:30; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: CCH; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PLTF'S COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (DEFT TO DEPOSIT $800 INTO COURT REGISTRY BY 4PM ON 11/16/20 - CLERK FEE WAIVED / ALSO FILE PROOF OF EMPLOYMENT & COVID RELIEF APPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS VIDEO - 11/12/2020 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketEvent CCH scheduled on 11/12/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BOX BY CSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (NO $ IN REGISTRY)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase Filed date changed to 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (MARTHA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (LEASE ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CC000358CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less