This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 02:26:22 (UTC).

ZENKOR FUND G1, LLC VS NIEVES, JORGE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 ZENKOR FUND G1, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NIEVES, JORGE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENKOR FUND G1, LLC

Defendants

PAEZ, ROSALY

NIEVES, JORGE

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/15/2020:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/05/2020:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (NO $ IN REGISTRY)

10/05/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (NO $ IN REGISTRY)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (JORGE) IND

09/28/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (JORGE) IND

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (ROSALY) SUB

09/28/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (ROSALY) SUB

ANSWER (JORGE)

09/25/2020:ANSWER (JORGE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (ROSALY)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (ROSALY)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (JORGE)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (JORGE)

AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

09/21/2020:AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

3 - DAY NOTICE

09/21/2020:3 - DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (LEASE ATTACHED)

09/21/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (LEASE ATTACHED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S BASKET BY CSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (NO $ IN REGISTRY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (JORGE) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 9/24/2020 (ROSALY) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (JORGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197576

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (ROSALY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY BP (JORGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (LEASE ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CC000359CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENKOR FUND G1 LLC is a litigant