This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 15:34:14 (UTC).

WINDSHIELD WARRIORS LLC AAO TY VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 WINDSHIELD WARRIORS LLC AAO TY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINDSHIELD WARRIORS LLC AAO TY

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, KRISTY LEE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

10/12/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

PLTF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/23/2020:PLTF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/22/2020:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (GEICO GENERAL INS CO)

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (GEICO GENERAL INS CO)

COMPLAINT

09/21/2020:COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/21/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/21/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: MICHAEL D. CERASA FOR PLTF)

09/21/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: MICHAEL D. CERASA FOR PLTF)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/03/2020 14:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/03/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 11/3/2020 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 11/3/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESET (CC/SC) on 10/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (GEICO GENERAL INS CO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 11/3/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: MICHAEL D. CERASA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020SC000490SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less