This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 11/28/2019 at 13:31:13 (UTC).

WILSON, FAITH L VS OTTINGTER, JASON Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 WILSON, FAITH L filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OTTINGTER, JASON. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON, FAITH L

Defendants

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

OTTINGTER, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETTI, DOUGLAS KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, JONATHON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

06/22/2021:FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKET, INC'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/03/2020:PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKET, INC'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/07/2020:DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEF'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

07/07/2020:DEF'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION 6/23/20 (DENNIS) IND

06/24/2020:SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION 6/23/20 (DENNIS) IND

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOS (9/24/2020- KYLE KILBURN @ 1:00 PM; MICHAEL AUBREY @ 2:30 PM)

08/20/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOS (9/24/2020- KYLE KILBURN @ 1:00 PM; MICHAEL AUBREY @ 2:30 PM)

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOS (9/23/2020- MARGAUX MARRA @ 1:00 PM; JULIE WATSON @ 2:30 PM)

08/20/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOS (9/23/2020- MARGAUX MARRA @ 1:00 PM; JULIE WATSON @ 2:30 PM)

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOSITIONS (DENNIS KOSELE 9/2/20 @ 2:00PM)

08/20/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOSITIONS (DENNIS KOSELE 9/2/20 @ 2:00PM)

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

08/14/2020:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING (EXHIBITS)

09/03/2020:DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING (EXHIBITS)

DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS

08/28/2020:DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

03/01/2021:NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

PLTF'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFS

09/23/2020:PLTF'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLTF'S AMENDED SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFS

09/24/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLTF'S AMENDED SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF

SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOSITIONS (MARGAUX MARRA 9/23/20 @ 1:30PM; JULIE WATSON 9/23/20 @ 2:30PM)

09/22/2020:SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL VIDEO DEPOSITIONS (MARGAUX MARRA 9/23/20 @ 1:30PM; JULIE WATSON 9/23/20 @ 2:30PM)

AMENDED SUBPOENA FOR DEPO SERVED 9/14/20 (DENNIS KOSELE) IND

09/15/2020:AMENDED SUBPOENA FOR DEPO SERVED 9/14/20 (DENNIS KOSELE) IND

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

11/04/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: JONATHON S MILLER Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER -DEF PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT (ATTY MILLER FOR DEF- PUBLIX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 11/6/2019 (PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC) CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketJudge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 179924

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CA000580GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNETTI , DOUGLAS KEVIN