This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/03/2019 at 14:32:13 (UTC).

WILSON, ELLEN FLORA VS MELVIN, ALICIA

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 WILSON, ELLEN FLORA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MELVIN, ALICIA. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON, ELLEN FLORA

Defendant

MELVIN, ALICIA

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

05/31/2019:MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW

05/31/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW

ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/22/2019 (ALICIA) POSTED

05/23/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/22/2019 (ALICIA) POSTED

RECEIPT MX 169580

05/17/2019:RECEIPT MX 169580

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROP MANAGER BY AG (ALICIA)

05/17/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROP MANAGER BY AG (ALICIA)

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/17/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

AFFIDAVIT OF INCORRECT SUMMONS

05/17/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INCORRECT SUMMONS

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ALICIA)

05/16/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ALICIA)

RECEIPT MX 169053

05/10/2019:RECEIPT MX 169053

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (ALICIA)

05/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (ALICIA)

AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

05/10/2019:AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

3 - DAY NOTICE

05/10/2019:3 - DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

05/10/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/22/2019 (ALICIA) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT MX 169580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROP MANAGER BY AG (ALICIA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INCORRECT SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (ALICIA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Case 282019CC000282CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less