This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 02/11/2022 at 13:35:56 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET VS JAMES, JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES, JAMES. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendants

JAMES, JAMES

MOORE FUNK, ELIZABETH

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW (JAMES FUNK AND ELIZABETH MOORE FUNK)

02/09/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW (JAMES FUNK AND ELIZABETH MOORE FUNK)

PROPOSED DEFAULT

02/08/2022:PROPOSED DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PLTF'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT (JAMES FUNK & ELIZABETH MOORE FUNK)

02/08/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PLTF'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT (JAMES FUNK & ELIZABETH MOORE FUNK)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEF (UNK TENANT #1 AND UNK TENANT #2)

02/08/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEF (UNK TENANT #1 AND UNK TENANT #2)

ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/01/2022:ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT #1)

01/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT #1)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT #2)

01/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT #2)

SUMMONS SERVED 1/19/2022 (ELIZABETH FUNK) IND

01/20/2022:SUMMONS SERVED 1/19/2022 (ELIZABETH FUNK) IND

SUMMONS SERVED 1/19/2022 (JAMES FUNK) IND

01/20/2022:SUMMONS SERVED 1/19/2022 (JAMES FUNK) IND

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ELIZABETH FUNK)

01/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ELIZABETH FUNK)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #2)

01/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #2)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #1)

01/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #1)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JAMES FUNK)

01/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JAMES FUNK)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

01/13/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

01/13/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

01/13/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

01/13/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

01/13/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW (JAMES FUNK AND ELIZABETH MOORE FUNK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT 2 dismissed 2/8/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT 1 dismissed 2/8/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PLTF'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT (JAMES FUNK & ELIZABETH MOORE FUNK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEF (UNK TENANT #1 AND UNK TENANT #2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT #2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 1/19/2022 (ELIZABETH FUNK) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($59,190.27)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $950.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase 282022CA000007GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.