This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 14:30:22 (UTC).

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, L VS SINCLAIR, UTRIE

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, L filed an Other lawsuit against SINCLAIR, UTRIE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, L

Defendants

SINCLAIR, UTRIE

THOMAS, MONIKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER (UTRIE;MONIKE)

06/21/2019:ANSWER (UTRIE;MONIKE)

SUMMONS SERVED 6/6/19 (UTRIE) IND

06/14/2019:SUMMONS SERVED 6/6/19 (UTRIE) IND

EPORTAL RECEIPT

05/29/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (MONIKE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (MONIKE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (UTRIE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (UTRIE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY POLLACK & ROSEN PA FOR PLTF)

05/29/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY POLLACK & ROSEN PA FOR PLTF)

COMPLAINT

05/29/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER (UTRIE;MONIKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED 6/6/19 (UTRIE) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (MONIKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (UTRIE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Plaintiff Attorney: DAVID MICHAEL KAMINSKI Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY POLLACK & ROSEN PA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170046

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 282019CC000331CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less