This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/23/2019 at 17:30:31 (UTC).

WADE, ALAN, WADE, MARIE F Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 WADE, ALAN, WADE, MARIE F was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Decedent

WADE, MARIE F

Not Classified By Court

WADE, ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

NIELANDER, WILLIAM JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS *6/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 8/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * DANIELLE CAMPBELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVE BOND * JAIME CAMPBELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * ALAN WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • PETITION TO WAIVE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (intestate Florida resident - single petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case 282019CP000256PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less