This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:33:36 (UTC).

W PATRICK DANZEY DC PA VS BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 W PATRICK DANZEY DC PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY RITENOUR, RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W PATRICK DANZEY DC PA

Defendant

BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER, CHRIS

Defendant Attorney

PETERSON, JAMES EARL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL (JAMES PETERSON, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFT)

04/19/2022:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL (JAMES PETERSON, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFT)

MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION TO THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE WITH KNOWLEDGE OF THE HANDLING OF THE CLAIM

01/18/2022:MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION TO THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE WITH KNOWLEDGE OF THE HANDLING OF THE CLAIM

NOTICE OF FILING 2016 PIP STATUTE

12/17/2021:NOTICE OF FILING 2016 PIP STATUTE

NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

12/17/2021:NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

PLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF

12/07/2021:PLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF

PLTF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEF

12/07/2021:PLTF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRNIC DELIVERY **ADDRESS UPDATED BY CLERK**

11/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRNIC DELIVERY **ADDRESS UPDATED BY CLERK**

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 10-11-21

11/22/2021:NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 10-11-21

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/19/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/01/2021:REPLY TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER /AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES/DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (BRISTOL WEST)

11/01/2021:ANSWER /AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES/DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (BRISTOL WEST)

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DEFT'S) - 45 DAY EXT

10/14/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DEFT'S) - 45 DAY EXT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY PENA FOR DEFT)

10/14/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY PENA FOR DEFT)

DISPOSITION MEMO: PL 10 DAYS TO FILE ROS; FJ IF SERVED

10/06/2021:DISPOSITION MEMO: PL 10 DAYS TO FILE ROS; FJ IF SERVED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL AS TO TIME AND VIRTUAL COURT APPEARANCE (10/5/21 @ 1:15 PM)

09/16/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL AS TO TIME AND VIRTUAL COURT APPEARANCE (10/5/21 @ 1:15 PM)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

08/26/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (BISTOL WEST INS. CO.)

08/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (BISTOL WEST INS. CO.)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: CHRIS KASPER FOR PLTF)

08/26/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: CHRIS KASPER FOR PLTF)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: James Earl Peterson Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL (JAMES PETERSON, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION TO THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE WITH KNOWLEDGE OF THE HANDLING OF THE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING 2016 PIP STATUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRNIC DELIVERY **ADDRESS UPDATED BY CLERK**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 10-11-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS /PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLTF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 217448

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $90.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000643SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON , JAMES EARL