This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 20:31:00 (UTC).

VANHOUTEN, JAMES II VS BARNES, RUBY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 VANHOUTEN, JAMES II filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BARNES, RUBY. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE, HEATHER WHITE BEATO and BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

HEATHER WHITE BEATO

BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VANHOUTEN, JAMES II

Respondent

BARNES, RUBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ACCORSI, ANTHONY ALBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONCLUSTION OF REPRESENTATION: ATTY ACCORSI FOR THE FMR HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketPetitioner Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION W/ MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event FAMHEAR on 12/2/2020 0900 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 12/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED SERVED 11/23/20 (RUBY) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING (12/2/20 9AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (12/2/2020 @ 9:00AM) VIRTUAL HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING : AMENDED (12/2/20 @ 9:00AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES (NONE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 282020DR000688FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACCORSI, ANTHONY ALBERT