This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/29/2019 at 17:31:51 (UTC).

VAN CLEEF, GEORGE LARRY, VAN CLEEF, KRISTIE LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 VAN CLEEF, GEORGE LARRY, VAN CLEEF, KRISTIE LEE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAN CLEEF, LARRY JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court

VAN CLEEF, SHERI LYNN

VAN CLEEF, KRISTIE LEE

Decedent

VAN CLEEF, GEORGE LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KEIBER, MICHAEL LANCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 6/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES *ESTATE OF BARBARA DEE QUERCIA PC19-306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Personal Rep Attorney: MICHAEL LANCE KEIBER Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PETITIONER/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND *KRISTIE LEE VAN CLEEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PETITIONER/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND *SHERI LYNN VAN CLEEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Case 282019CP000355PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEIBER, MICHAEL LANCE