This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/07/2019 at 14:30:36 (UTC).

UNITED ELITE CORPORATION VS LANE, JOHN

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 UNITED ELITE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LANE, JOHN. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY, RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL) and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CRIMINAL). The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CRIMINAL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED ELITE CORPORATION

Defendant

LANE, JOHN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CKW

06/04/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CKW

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

05/31/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

05/29/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY BLJ (JOHN)

05/29/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY BLJ (JOHN)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/15/2019 (JOHN) POSTED

05/21/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/15/2019 (JOHN) POSTED

RECEIPT MX 169323

05/14/2019:RECEIPT MX 169323

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW (JOHN)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW (JOHN)

AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

05/14/2019:AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

3 - DAY NOTICE

05/14/2019:3 - DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

05/14/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CKW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY BLJ (JOHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/15/2019 (JOHN) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT MX 169323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY CKW (JOHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Case 282019CC000295CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less