This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/20/2019 at 13:31:35 (UTC).

TOMPKINS, JAMES E VS JONES, ASHLEY T Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 TOMPKINS, JAMES E filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JONES, ASHLEY T. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOMPKINS, JAMES E

Defendants

JONES, ASHLEY T

JONES, RUSSELL B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CELAYA, ROBERTO PABLO

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR ALL PARTIES (4/7/2021 @ 9:30 AM)

02/19/2021:ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR ALL PARTIES (4/7/2021 @ 9:30 AM)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (ATTY BERT HARRIS III)

05/12/2020:STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (ATTY BERT HARRIS III)

ORDER ON PLTF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLTF (DWM2, LLC)

05/12/2020:ORDER ON PLTF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLTF (DWM2, LLC)

PLTF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLTF

05/07/2020:PLTF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLTF

SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/3/2019 (ASHLEY) SUB

10/07/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/3/2019 (ASHLEY) SUB

SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/3/2019 (RUSSELL) IND

10/07/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/3/2019 (RUSSELL) IND

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/30/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ASHLEY)

09/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ASHLEY)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (RUSSELL)

09/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (RUSSELL)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/27/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/27/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

09/27/2019:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

CERTIFICATION REGARDING PROMISSORY NOTE

09/27/2019:CERTIFICATION REGARDING PROMISSORY NOTE

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

09/27/2019:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($27,872.83)

09/27/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($27,872.83)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/3/2019 (ASHLEY) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/3/2019 (RUSSELL) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ASHLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (RUSSELL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 177532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $429.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION REGARDING PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($27,872.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $429.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 282019CA000517GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CELAYA, ROBERTO PABLO