This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/05/2019 at 14:30:51 (UTC).

THE VAZQUEZ INVESTMENT GROUP VS TYRONE, CAPUCINE

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 THE VAZQUEZ INVESTMENT GROUP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TYRONE, CAPUCINE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY, RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL) and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CRIMINAL). The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CRIMINAL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE VAZQUEZ INVESTMENT GROUP

Defendant

TYRONE, CAPUCINE

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

05/31/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT

JUDICIAL DEFAULT

05/31/2019:JUDICIAL DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION **FORWARD TO JUDGE'S BASKET FOR REVIEW**

05/21/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION **FORWARD TO JUDGE'S BASKET FOR REVIEW**

ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR 1ST AND LAST MONTH RENT

05/20/2019:ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR 1ST AND LAST MONTH RENT

SUMMONS SERVED 5/13/19 (CAPUCINE) - POSTED

05/14/2019:SUMMONS SERVED 5/13/19 (CAPUCINE) - POSTED

RECEIPT MX 169158

05/13/2019:RECEIPT MX 169158

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY AG (CAPUCINE)

05/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY AG (CAPUCINE)

3 - DAY NOTICE

05/13/2019:3 - DAY NOTICE

TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT (LEASE ATTACHED)

05/13/2019:TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT (LEASE ATTACHED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION **FORWARD TO JUDGE'S BASKET FOR REVIEW**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR 1ST AND LAST MONTH RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED 5/13/19 (CAPUCINE) - POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT MX 169158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY AG (CAPUCINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT (LEASE ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case 282019CC000289CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less