This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/07/2019 at 14:30:29 (UTC).

SUN COMMUNITIES ACQUISITIONS L VS ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES BENEFICIAR Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 SUN COMMUNITIES ACQUISITIONS L filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES BENEFICIAR. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL). The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN COMMUNITIES ACQUISITIONS L

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES BENEFICIAR

HALL, EDWARD J

HALL, HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHASE, BRIAN CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/29/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (ALL UNK, PARTIES, BENE, HEIRS) POSTED

05/28/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (ALL UNK, PARTIES, BENE, HEIRS) POSTED

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (HELEN) POSTED

05/28/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (HELEN) POSTED

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (EDWARD) POSTED

05/28/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (EDWARD) POSTED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (ALL UNK PARTIES, ETC)

05/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (ALL UNK PARTIES, ETC)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (HELEN)

05/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (HELEN)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (EDWARD)

05/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (EDWARD)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ALL UNK. PARTIES, BENE, HEIRS)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ALL UNK. PARTIES, BENE, HEIRS)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (EDWARD)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (EDWARD)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (HELEN)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (HELEN)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

05/14/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EPORTAL RECEIPT

05/14/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Case Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (ALL UNK, PARTIES, BENE, HEIRS) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (HELEN) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/25/2019 (EDWARD) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (ALL UNK PARTIES, ETC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (HELEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (EDWARD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ALL UNK. PARTIES, BENE, HEIRS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (EDWARD)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169325

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $215.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Case 282019CC000298CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less