This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/05/2019 at 19:30:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Appellee

STATE OF FLORIDA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILINGS SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL, THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND E.C.R.

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL FILINGS SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL, THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND E.C.R.

NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/APPEAL (PD)

05/28/2019:ORDER APPT COUNSEL/APPEAL (PD)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

05/23/2019:NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

DESIGNATION TO COURT REPORTER

05/23/2019:DESIGNATION TO COURT REPORTER

DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

05/23/2019:DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

STATEMENT JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED

05/23/2019:STATEMENT JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED

NOTICE OF APPEAL

05/23/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL

MEMORANDUM

05/23/2019:MEMORANDUM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILINGS SENT TO THE 2DCA, ATTORNEY GENERAL, THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND E.C.R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Appellant Attorney: HOWARD L DIMMIG Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPT COUNSEL/APPEAL (PD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION TO COURT REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • State Attorney Case Number modified: JL 18-361

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Prosecutor: ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Case 282019AP000029APAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less