This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/09/2019 at 16:32:25 (UTC).

SAGER, THOMAS SANFORD VS SAGER, VICTORIA LYNNE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 SAGER, THOMAS SANFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAGER, VICTORIA LYNNE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are McDANIEL, MICHAEL P and MICHAEL McDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

McDANIEL, MICHAEL P

MICHAEL McDANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAGER, THOMAS SANFORD

Respondent

SAGER, VICTORIA LYNNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Event PRO SE COURT scheduled on 8/16/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL McDANIEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • ANSWER WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION**Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT**Victoria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER**Victoria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN Model 1**3 copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT SUBMITTED**3 copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT**signed by both parties**3 copies

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • PRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169578

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case 282019DR000488FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Judge: McDANIEL , MICHAEL P assigned

    Read MoreRead Less