This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:37:45 (UTC).

RODGERS, RAYMOND VS SOTO, ONIX

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 RODGERS, RAYMOND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOTO, ONIX. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODGERS, RAYMOND

Defendant

SOTO, ONIX

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL ACCEPTED 2/22/22 (RAYMOND RODGERS)

03/07/2022:CERTIFIED MAIL ACCEPTED 2/22/22 (RAYMOND RODGERS)

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD)

02/21/2022:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD)

AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN REGISTRY *AMENDED ONLY TO CORRECT PLTF'S NAME IN PARAGRAPH 2**

02/21/2022:AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN REGISTRY *AMENDED ONLY TO CORRECT PLTF'S NAME IN PARAGRAPH 2**

ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS

02/18/2022:ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS

PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN REGISTRY (FORWARDED ELECTRONICALLY TO JA BY CKW)

02/17/2022:PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN REGISTRY (FORWARDED ELECTRONICALLY TO JA BY CKW)

NOTICE TO PLTF FROM CLERK ADVISING OF MONIES AVAILABLE IN REGISTRY OF COURT REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK

02/16/2022:NOTICE TO PLTF FROM CLERK ADVISING OF MONIES AVAILABLE IN REGISTRY OF COURT REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN BY CLERK

02/16/2022:SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN BY CLERK

FUNDS DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY OF COURT / NOTICE OF DEFT'S PAYMENT OF TOTAL AMOUNT OF FINAL JUD + INTEREST $2,336.94

02/16/2022:FUNDS DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY OF COURT / NOTICE OF DEFT'S PAYMENT OF TOTAL AMOUNT OF FINAL JUD + INTEREST $2,336.94

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR CONTEMPT **COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY AG**

02/15/2022:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR CONTEMPT **COPY TO JUDGE'S OFFICE ELECTRONICALLY BY AG**

ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION FOR FACT INFO SHEET

12/09/2021:ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION FOR FACT INFO SHEET

MOTION FOR FACT INFO SHEET (COPY TO JUDGE'S BASKET BY CSD)

11/05/2021:MOTION FOR FACT INFO SHEET (COPY TO JUDGE'S BASKET BY CSD)

FINAL JUDGMENT

10/28/2021:FINAL JUDGMENT

MEDIATORS REPORT (NON-AGREEMENT) (DEFT FTA) - COPY TO JUDGE'S BASKET BY CSD

10/19/2021:MEDIATORS REPORT (NON-AGREEMENT) (DEFT FTA) - COPY TO JUDGE'S BASKET BY CSD

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION (10/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - DEFT

09/29/2021:NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION (10/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - DEFT

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION (10/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - PLTF

09/29/2021:NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION (10/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM) - PLTF

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - PARTIES ORDERED TO CONTACT MEDIATION SERVICES WITHIN 10 DAYS

09/21/2021:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - PARTIES ORDERED TO CONTACT MEDIATION SERVICES WITHIN 10 DAYS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (9/21/2021 @ 3:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

09/09/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (9/21/2021 @ 3:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

SUMMONS SERVED 8/16/2021 (ONIX) IND

08/18/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 8/16/2021 (ONIX) IND

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL ACCEPTED 2/22/22 (RAYMOND RODGERS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPEN CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN REGISTRY *AMENDED ONLY TO CORRECT PLTF'S NAME IN PARAGRAPH 2**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket*****CLERK'S NOTE: WAITING ON AMENDED ORDER TO DISBURSE REGARDING NAME OF PLTF****

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN REGISTRY (FORWARDED ELECTRONICALLY TO JA BY CKW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILER / RAYMOND RODGERS - 9489009000276070723302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF FROM CLERK ADVISING OF MONIES AVAILABLE IN REGISTRY OF COURT REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 216526

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF BY AG (ONIX)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - WITH PROOF OF PAYMENT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 9/21/2021 at 0100 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000604SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less