This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 20:10:40 (UTC).

RICHARDSON, JENNIFER KRUPA Et Al VS MASTRANGELO, JASON MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 RICHARDSON, JENNIFER KRUPA filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MASTRANGELO, JASON MICHAEL. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE and BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RICHARDSON, JENNIFER KRUPA

THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE

Respondent

MASTRANGELO, JASON MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PALMER, SARA-JEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY MSE (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SAO BY LD (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAttorney: SARA-JEAN PALMER Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: BUTZ , KELLY PAIGE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES (2017DP-215)(15DR7639)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK TO: (JASON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 282020DR000680FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALMER, SARA-JEAN