Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 02/02/2021 at 14:11:10 (UTC).

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC VS BRACELLY, JOHN R Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRACELLY, JOHN R. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

HIGHLANDS COUNTY A POLITICAL S

BRACELLY, JOHN R

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

BRACELLY, TJANDRA

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRIC

HIGHLANDS PARK ESTATES ASSOCIA

HIGHLANDS COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'KEEFFE, LORETTA COMISKEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

12/18/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 2)

11/18/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 2)

SUMMONS SERVED 11/4/20 (JOHN) IND

11/18/2020:SUMMONS SERVED 11/4/20 (JOHN) IND

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 1)

11/18/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 1)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 11/4/2020 (TJANDRA) SUB

11/18/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 11/4/2020 (TJANDRA) SUB

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICK D/B/A MEMORIAL REGIONAL HOSPITAL)

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICK D/B/A MEMORIAL REGIONAL HOSPITAL)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (HIGHLANDS PARK ESTATES ASSOC)

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (HIGHLANDS PARK ESTATES ASSOC)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #1)

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #1)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (TJANDRA)

10/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (TJANDRA)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/29/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/29/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/29/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/29/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/29/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/29/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

10/29/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($55,029.00)

10/29/2020:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($55,029.00)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/29/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 11/4/20 (JOHN) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 11/4/2020 (HIGHLANDS COUNTY, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FL) CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 11/4/2020 (TJANDRA) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 11/6/2020 (SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICT DBA MEMORIAL REGIONAL HOSPITAL) CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT (TJANDRA AND JOHN BRACELLY) Forwarded electronically to JA by ckw

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($55,029.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $991.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CA000347GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIGHLANDS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where South Broward Hospital District is a litigant

Latest cases where Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'keeffe, Loretta Comiskey