This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/25/2019 at 17:30:54 (UTC).

RABEN, JAMES A, RABEN, JAMES R Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 RABEN, JAMES A, RABEN, JAMES R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RABEN, WILLIAM L

RABEN, JAMES R

Decedent

RABEN, JAMES A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 10-25-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT OF FOREIGN WILL FROM ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 173894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * WILLIAM L. RABEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • PET TO ADMIT FOREIGN WILL TO REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Case 282019CP000349PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT