This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 00:43:10 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS RUTHERFORD, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUTHERFORD, DANIEL. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY RITENOUR, RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

RUTHERFORD, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RACQUEL ANN

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

01/07/2021:DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE OF HEARING (1/05/2021 @ 1:45 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

12/18/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (1/05/2021 @ 1:45 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - PLTF'S ATTORNEY ANNOUNCED, PLTF IS SEEKING AN AGREEMENT AND REQUESTED A CONTINUANCE TO 1/05/2021 @ 1PM

11/05/2020:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - PLTF'S ATTORNEY ANNOUNCED, PLTF IS SEEKING AN AGREEMENT AND REQUESTED A CONTINUANCE TO 1/05/2021 @ 1PM

NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

10/13/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/28/2020 (DANIEL) IND

10/02/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/28/2020 (DANIEL) IND

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DANIEL)

09/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DANIEL)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/23/2020:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/22/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/22/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/5/2021 0145 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 1/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/05/2021 13:45; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/05/2021 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (1/05/2021 @ 1:45 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 1/5/2021 at 0145 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/5/2021 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESET (CC/SC) on 12/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMORANDUM - PLTF'S ATTORNEY ANNOUNCED, PLTF IS SEEKING AN AGREEMENT AND REQUESTED A CONTINUANCE TO 1/05/2021 @ 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 1/5/2021 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 11/3/2020 0130 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 11/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 282020SC000492SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN