This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 15:30:15 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS PEREZ, JESMARIE M

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEREZ, JESMARIE M. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY, ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

PEREZ, JESMARIE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/04/2019 (JESMARIE) IND

06/04/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/04/2019 (JESMARIE) IND

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/29/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

05/29/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESMARIE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESMARIE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 6/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/04/2019 (JESMARIE) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESMARIE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 7/9/2019 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Plaintiff Attorney: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170088

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 282019SC000342SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Event Date: 07/09/2019 13:00:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: MX COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less