This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 00:31:03 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MUSICK, LON

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MUSICK, LON. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY RITENOUR, RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

MUSICK, LON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RACQUEL ANN

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

11/06/2020:DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/22/2020 (LON) IND

10/26/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/22/2020 (LON) IND

NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

10/13/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (LON)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (LON)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/21/2020:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/18/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/18/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/18/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 11/3/2020 0130 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 11/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/03/2020 13:30; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/03/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 10/22/2020 (LON) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 11/3/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 11/3/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESET (CC/SC) on 10/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (LON)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197446

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 282020SC000489SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN