Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 00:42:46 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MEREDITH, VIRGINIA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEREDITH, VIRGINIA. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY RITENOUR, RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN and RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

MEREDITH, VIRGINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST VIRGINIA MEREDITH

01/28/2021:FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST VIRGINIA MEREDITH

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND BILL OF SALE

01/06/2021:NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND BILL OF SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/06/2021:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

**PROPOSED** FACT INFORMATION SHEET

01/06/2021:**PROPOSED** FACT INFORMATION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (VIRGINIA)

01/06/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (VIRGINIA)

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

01/06/2021:AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

11/06/2020:DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/22/2020 (VIRGINIA) IND

10/26/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/22/2020 (VIRGINIA) IND

NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

10/12/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (11/03/2020 @ 1:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

EPORTAL RECEIPT

09/22/2020:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (VIRGINIA)

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (VIRGINIA)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST VIRGINIA MEREDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket**PROPOSED** FACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (VIRGINIA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 11/3/2020 0130 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 10/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020SC000491SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE JESUS , JOHN BACUS