This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 11/09/2019 at 13:30:13 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS GUTIERREZ, HECTOR JR

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GUTIERREZ, HECTOR JR. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, HECTOR JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEGGESTAD, LAUREN MARGOT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK PARTIES 1-4; ANY AND ALL UNKS)

01/29/2020:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK PARTIES 1-4; ANY AND ALL UNKS)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 2/16/2021) HARD COPY

02/15/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 2/16/2021) HARD COPY

NOTICE OF HEARING (5/4/20 @ 9:00AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTYS' AND COSTS

03/24/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (5/4/20 @ 9:00AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTYS' AND COSTS

ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE (11/18/20 @ 11:00AM)

11/10/2020:ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE (11/18/20 @ 11:00AM)

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMIN.ORDER 3-29.2

04/16/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMIN.ORDER 3-29.2

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)

03/01/2021:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) SIGNED BY ATTY

01/21/2021:NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) SIGNED BY ATTY

PLTF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE

12/23/2020:PLTF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/09/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ADDING MACHINE TAPE

10/09/2020:ADDING MACHINE TAPE

MOTION TO RESCHEDULE 11/18/2020 FORECLOSURE SALE

11/17/2020:MOTION TO RESCHEDULE 11/18/2020 FORECLOSURE SALE

ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE (2/16/21 @ 11:00AM)

12/18/2020:ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE (2/16/21 @ 11:00AM)

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC FINAL FORECLOSURE HEARING (10/1/20 @ 10:30AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTYS' FEES AND COST

09/03/2020:NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC FINAL FORECLOSURE HEARING (10/1/20 @ 10:30AM) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTYS' FEES AND COST

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF ATTY FEES AND COST AND REASONABLE ATTY'S FEES

01/29/2020:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF ATTY FEES AND COST AND REASONABLE ATTY'S FEES

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

10/30/2019:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/30/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/30/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK PARTY #2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK PARTY #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (GICEL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (HECTOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 179686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $967.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, HECTOR GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, HECTOR GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($110,545.67)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $967.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Case 282019CA000569GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN HEGGESTAD, ESQ