This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:22:43 (UTC).

OREGON, JULIE VS SOMARRIBA, YAMIL ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 OREGON, JULIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOMARRIBA, YAMIL ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are McDANIEL, MICHAEL P, BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE and KELLY BUTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

McDANIEL, MICHAEL P

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

KELLY BUTZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OREGON, JULIE

Respondent

SOMARRIBA, YAMIL ENRIQUE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRO SE COURT on 7/13/2020 0230 PM Judge KELLY BUTZ results DISPOSED on 7/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 193690

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 Total Assessed $6.75 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $6.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket**AMENDED**PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT SUBMITTED (3 COPIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketORDER OF VIRTUAL HEARING 07/13/2020 @ 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketEvent PRO SE COURT scheduled on 7/13/2020 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge KELLY BUTZ presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER**Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENCY APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 282019DR001206FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: McDANIEL , MICHAEL P assigned

    Read MoreRead Less