This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 12:02:57 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU VS MULLIGAN, SHAWN R

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU filed an Other lawsuit against MULLIGAN, SHAWN R. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL) and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU

Defendant

MULLIGAN, SHAWN R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

07/01/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (SHAWN)

06/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (SHAWN)

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

06/17/2020:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

06/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (SHAWN)

02/24/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (SHAWN)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (SHAWN)

02/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (SHAWN)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

02/21/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/26/2019 (SHAWN) IND

12/27/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/26/2019 (SHAWN) IND

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

12/19/2019:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (SHAWN)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (SHAWN)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (SHAWN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (SHAWN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (SHAWN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CC000823CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less