This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 17:31:45 (UTC).

NELSON, GEORGE, NELSON, TIFFANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 NELSON, GEORGE, NELSON, TIFFANY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

NELSON, GEORGE

NELSON, TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE * KENNETH G. NELSON 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * GEORGE NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * TIFFANY NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * GEORGE NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (Intestate Florida Resident)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 206315

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CP000101PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA