This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 07/08/2019 13:32:36

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Property - Foreclosure case was filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA CH against HILL, STEVEN in the jurisdiction of Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Foreclosure
  • Jurisdiction Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County
  • Judge WARD, DAVID VINCENT
  • Courthouse Highlands County Courthouse
  • County Highlands
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant HILL, STEVEN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA CH
  • Represented By
    • MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/21/2019 (USA- DEPT OF TREASURY) GOV

06/26/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/21/2019 (USA- DEPT OF TREASUR...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/21/2019 (USA SEC/HOUS & URB/DEV) GOV

06/26/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/21/2019 (USA SEC/HOUS & URB/D...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/20/2019 (STEVEN) IND

06/24/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/20/2019 (STEVEN) IND

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK HEIRS, ETC)

06/24/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK HEIRS, ETC)

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (USA- DEPT OF TREASURY)

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (USA- DEPT OF TREAS...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (USA SEC/HOUS AND URB/DEV)

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (USA SEC/HOUS AND U...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEW SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 8/21/19
  • 07/03/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH (UNK HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, INT IN EST OF JOANNE HILL, ET AL)
  • 07/03/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (UNK HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, INT IN EST OF JOANNE HILL, ET AL)
  • 07/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF ACTION CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE (UNK HEIRS, BENEFICIAREIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, INT IN EST OF JOANNE HILL, ET AL)
  • 06/26/2019
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/21/2019 (USA- DEPT OF TREASURY) GOV
  • 06/26/2019
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/21/2019 (USA SEC/HOUS & URB/DEV) GOV
  • 06/24/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK HEIRS, ETC)
  • 06/24/2019
  • SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK HEIRS, ETC)
  • 06/24/2019
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 6/20/2019 (STEVEN) IND
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (USA- DEPT OF TREASURY)
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (USA SEC/HOUS AND URB/DEV)
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (UNK HEIRS, ETC)
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY BLJ (STEVEN)
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.