This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/20/2019 at 13:33:19 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA CH VS BREWER, DONALD R JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA CH filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BREWER, DONALD R JR. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA CH

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONALD R BRE

BREWER, DONALD R JR

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION 11/27/19) HARD COPY

11/13/2019:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION 11/27/19) HARD COPY

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

10/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (DONALD)

10/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (DONALD)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (DONALD)

10/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (DONALD)

NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 11/27/19

10/16/2019:NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 11/27/19

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

10/16/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (DONALD)

10/16/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (DONALD)

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (DONALD; UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

10/16/2019:AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (DONALD; UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (DONALD; UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

10/16/2019:NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (DONALD; UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

03/20/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD BREWER, JR.)

08/10/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD BREWER, JR.)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD BREWER, JR.)

08/10/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD BREWER, JR.)

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES

09/25/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE W/ADMIN ORDER 3-29.2

09/25/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE W/ADMIN ORDER 3-29.2

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE - 12/3/20 @ 11:00AM) HARD COPY

11/25/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE - 12/3/20 @ 11:00AM) HARD COPY

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)

12/15/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)

12/15/2020:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

10/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 11/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (DONALD; UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (DONALD; UNK SPOUSE OF DONALD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 10/4/2019 (USA SEC/HOUS & URB/DEV) GOV

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($82,434.37)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $947.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case 282019CA000516GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan