This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 16:37:24 (UTC).

MUTER, COURTNEY DIONNE VS AVIRETT, SHAWN R

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 MUTER, COURTNEY DIONNE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against AVIRETT, SHAWN R. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE and KELLY BUTZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

KELLY BUTZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MUTER, COURTNEY DIONNE

Respondent

AVIRETT, SHAWN R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event DV COURT on 10/15/2020 0830 AM Judge KELLY BUTZ results HEARING COMPLETED on 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (AFTER HEARING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING RETURNED SERVED 10/2/20 AT 7:37AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEvent DV COURT scheduled on 10/15/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge KELLY BUTZ presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event DV COURT on 10/1/2020 0830 AM Judge KELLY BUTZ results CONTINUED on 10/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING 10/15/20 AT 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING RETURNED SERVED 9/23/20 @ 2:17PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketActive Process Order To Appear disposition on 9/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION RELATIONSHIP FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPRO SE LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketActive Process Order To Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEvent DV COURT scheduled on 10/1/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge KELLY BUTZ presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 282020DR000684FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: BUTZ , KELLY PAIGE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less