This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:22:36 (UTC).

MORRIS, JIMMY RICH VS MORRIS, SHARON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MORRIS, JIMMY RICH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORRIS, SHARON. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are McDANIEL, MICHAEL P, BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE and KELLY BUTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

McDANIEL, MICHAEL P

BUTZ, KELLY PAIGE

KELLY BUTZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS, JIMMY RICH

Respondent

MORRIS, SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COPLEY, ALISON B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event FAMHEAR on 2/3/2020 0130 PM Judge KELLY BUTZ results HEARING COMPLETED on 2/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION W/ MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING (02/03/20 @ 1:30PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEvent FAMHEAR scheduled on 2/3/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge KELLY BUTZ presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 12/09/19 (SHARON) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPetitioner Attorney: Alison B Copley Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY MSE (SHARON)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY COPLEY FOR THE HUSBAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE) (SHARON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 181987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 282019DR001205FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less