This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/06/2019 at 17:32:06 (UTC).

MOORE, BARBARA J, OLSON, ANN M Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 MOORE, BARBARA J, OLSON, ANN M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

OLSON, ANN M

Decedent

MOORE, BARBARA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

LIVINGSTON, ROBERT EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169912

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * ANN M. OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 04/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Personal Rep Attorney: ROBERT EDWARD LIVINGSTON Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * ANN M. OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM GREATER THAN $1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • OATH OF WITNESS TO WILL OR CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • LAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 04/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169166

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case 282019CP000230PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less