This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/21/2019 at 17:32:34 (UTC).

MIETTY, GARY M, MIETTY, MARY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 MIETTY, GARY M, MIETTY, MARY ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

MIETTY, GARY M

Decedent

MIETTY, MARY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

CONSOLO, JEFFREY PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • ORIGINAL PROOF OF PUBLICATION 06/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • LETTER FROM MCDONALD HOPKINS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * GARY M. MIETTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • CORRECTION TO CERTIFICATE DEATH CERTIFICATE OR REPORRT OF FETAL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • CONSENT & WAIVER OF NOTICE OF PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION* PAUL A. MIETTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM GREATER THAN $1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169980

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Case 282019CP000251PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less