This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:03:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SMITHLEY, DONNA

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITHLEY, DONNA. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SMITHLEY, DONNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

ALIAS SUMMONS UNSERVED (DONNA)

03/14/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS UNSERVED (DONNA)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

03/06/2020:EPORTAL RECEIPT

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DONNA)

03/06/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DONNA)

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

03/05/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (DONNA)

12/31/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (DONNA)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DONNA)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DONNA)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/21/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 4/21/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 3/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS UNSERVED (DONNA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (DONNA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 4/21/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 187998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000816SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less