This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/10/2019 15:30:27

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/16/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC against CENATUS, BRUNEL in the jurisdiction of Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Highlands County Courts
  • Judge RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)
  • Courthouse Highlands County Courthouse
  • County Highlands
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
  • Represented By
    • CHATANI, PAYAL YASHWANT
  • Defendant CENATUS, BRUNEL
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

06/16/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (BRUNEL)

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (BRUNEL)

Free with Subscription
STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/16/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

Free with Subscription
EPORTAL RECEIPT

06/17/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

Free with Subscription
CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (BRUNEL)
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR
  • 06/17/2019
  • Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 7/30/2019 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned
  • 06/17/2019
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 171074
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO
  • 06/16/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
  • 06/16/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/16/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 06/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00
  • 06/16/2019
  • Case 282019SC000385SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/16/2019
  • 07/30/2019
  • Event Date: 07/30/2019 13:00:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: MX COURTR

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.