This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:02:54 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS SPIRES, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SPIRES, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

SPIRES, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/20/2020:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (TIMOTHY)

01/06/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (TIMOTHY)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (TIMOTHY)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (TIMOTHY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/28/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/28/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 1/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 1/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (TIMOTHY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (TIMOTHY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 1/28/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: PAYAL Y CHATANI Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000815SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less