This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:34:09 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS JACKSON, JERMAINE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACKSON, JERMAINE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

JACKSON, JERMAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/24/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

08/24/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JERMAINE)

08/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JERMAINE)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

08/25/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL AS TO TIME AND VIRTUAL COURT APPEARANCE (10/5/21 @ 2:15 PM)

09/16/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL AS TO TIME AND VIRTUAL COURT APPEARANCE (10/5/21 @ 2:15 PM)

SUMMONS SERVED 9/20/2021 (JERMAINE) SUB

09/21/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 9/20/2021 (JERMAINE) SUB

DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

10/06/2021:DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

12/23/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

12/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

12/23/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JERMAINE)

12/23/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JERMAINE)

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

02/07/2022:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JERMAINE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 10/5/2021 0215 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 10/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/05/2021 14:15; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/05/2021 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 217342

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000636SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B