This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 11/25/2019 at 13:30:42 (UTC).

MEJIAS, MIGUEL Et Al VS WERNER, L RANDY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 MEJIAS, MIGUEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WERNER, L RANDY. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOLINA, FRANK

MEJIAS, MIGUEL

Defendants

WERNER, ZENITH

WERNER, L RANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLOUD, MIA MANCINELLI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/22/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER GRANTING PLTFS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA STATUTE

05/26/2021:ORDER GRANTING PLTFS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA STATUTE

ORDER GRANTING PLTFS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF MORTALITY TABLES

05/26/2021:ORDER GRANTING PLTFS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF MORTALITY TABLES

ORDER GRANTING PLTFS' MOTION IN LIMINE

05/26/2021:ORDER GRANTING PLTFS' MOTION IN LIMINE

ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEF

05/26/2021:ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEF

PLTF'S NOTICE OF W/DRAWING PLTF'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/26/2021:PLTF'S NOTICE OF W/DRAWING PLTF'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ADMISSION OF LIABILITY AND WITHDRAWAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/26/2021:NOTICE OF ADMISSION OF LIABILITY AND WITHDRAWAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AS A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR ALL PARTIES (6/24/21 @ 1:30PM)

05/17/2021:ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AS A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR ALL PARTIES (6/24/21 @ 1:30PM)

DEFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/13/2021:DEFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

PLTF FRANK MOLINA'S RESPONSE TO DEFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2020:PLTF FRANK MOLINA'S RESPONSE TO DEFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

PLTF MIGUEL MEJIAS' RESPONSE TO DEFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2020:PLTF MIGUEL MEJIAS' RESPONSE TO DEFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF, MIGUEL MEJIAS

01/23/2020:SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF, MIGUEL MEJIAS

SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF, FRANK MOLINA

01/23/2020:SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF, FRANK MOLINA

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF POTENTIAL CONFLICT

02/07/2020:DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF POTENTIAL CONFLICT

PLTF'S NOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL

02/06/2020:PLTF'S NOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS (FRANK MOLINA 4/16/20 @ 9:30AM; MIGUEL MEJIAS 11:00AM)

02/12/2020:DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS (FRANK MOLINA 4/16/20 @ 9:30AM; MIGUEL MEJIAS 11:00AM)

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (ZENITH WERNER 4/16/20 @ 1:00PM; L RANDY WERNER 4/16/20 @ 3:00PM)

02/13/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (ZENITH WERNER 4/16/20 @ 1:00PM; L RANDY WERNER 4/16/20 @ 3:00PM)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (3/25/20 @ 3:00PM)

02/13/2020:NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (3/25/20 @ 3:00PM)

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTFS' MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ZENITH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (L. RANDY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketJudge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLTF FRANK MOLINA'S NOTICE OF SERVING PLTF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ZENITH WERNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLTF FRANK MOLINA'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, ZENITH WERNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 179762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CA000572GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLOUD , MIA MANCINELLI